This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 18:20:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS BRLECIC, WAYNE A

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRLECIC, WAYNE A. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

BRLECIC, WAYNE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON WAYNE A BRLECIC 092820

09/30/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON WAYNE A BRLECIC 092820

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WAUME A BRELCIC, PTC 110420 @ 9:00AM, CRTRM B

09/25/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WAUME A BRELCIC, PTC 110420 @ 9:00AM, CRTRM B

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

09/21/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1220.55

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1220.55

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON WAYNE A BRLECIC 092820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WAUME A BRELCIC, PTC 110420 @ 9:00AM, CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WAYNE A BRLECIC ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $1220.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 699603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020SC001912SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less