This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 16:55:59 (UTC).

MIA C PROPERTIES INC VS CARMICHAEL, COLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 MIA C PROPERTIES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARMICHAEL, COLE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIA C PROPERTIES INC

Defendants

CARMICHAEL, COLE

CARMICHAEL, TIFFANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON, DAVID EARL

 

Court Documents

ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED SRVD ON COLE CARMICHAEL (SUBST) 100121

10/11/2021:ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED SRVD ON COLE CARMICHAEL (SUBST) 100121

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - AIAS SUMMONS ON COLE CARMICHAEL (SUBST SERVED TO KRYSTAL CARMICHAEL) 100121

10/06/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - AIAS SUMMONS ON COLE CARMICHAEL (SUBST SERVED TO KRYSTAL CARMICHAEL) 100121

STIPULATION FILED AS TO TIFFANY CARMICHAEL ONLY - DEF AGREES TO PAY THE SUM OF $1621.20 BY PAYING INITIAL PYMNT OF $50.00 ON OR BEFORE 092421 AND MIN MO PYMNT OF $100.00 THEREAFTER ON THE 24TH OF EA MO

10/01/2021:STIPULATION FILED AS TO TIFFANY CARMICHAEL ONLY - DEF AGREES TO PAY THE SUM OF $1621.20 BY PAYING INITIAL PYMNT OF $50.00 ON OR BEFORE 092421 AND MIN MO PYMNT OF $100.00 THEREAFTER ON THE 24TH OF EA MO

COURT WORKSHEET - NO ACTION

09/22/2021:COURT WORKSHEET - NO ACTION

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: COLE CARMICHAEL - PTC 110821 AT 12:15PM CRTRM C

09/15/2021:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: COLE CARMICHAEL - PTC 110821 AT 12:15PM CRTRM C

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TIFFANY CARMICHAEL - PTC 110821 AT 12:15PM CRTRM C

09/15/2021:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TIFFANY CARMICHAEL - PTC 110821 AT 12:15PM CRTRM C

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: COLE CARMICHAEL *BLANK*

09/13/2021:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: COLE CARMICHAEL *BLANK*

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TIFFANY CARMICHAEL *BLANK*

09/13/2021:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TIFFANY CARMICHAEL *BLANK*

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN UNSRVD - SUMMONS ON COLE CARMICHAEL

08/24/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN UNSRVD - SUMMONS ON COLE CARMICHAEL

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN UNSRVD - SUMMONS ON TIFFANY CARMICHAEL

08/24/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN UNSRVD - SUMMONS ON TIFFANY CARMICHAEL

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED (SUMMONS/NTC TO APPEAR FOR PTC) ON COLE CARMICHAEL (NOT FOUND)

08/19/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED (SUMMONS/NTC TO APPEAR FOR PTC) ON COLE CARMICHAEL (NOT FOUND)

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED (SUMMONS/NTC TO APPEAR FOR PTC) ON TIFFANY CARMICHAEL (NOT FOUND)

08/19/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED (SUMMONS/NTC TO APPEAR FOR PTC) ON TIFFANY CARMICHAEL (NOT FOUND)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM 795.00

07/13/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM 795.00

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TIFFANY CARMICHAEL - PTC 092221 1045AM CRTRM C

07/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TIFFANY CARMICHAEL - PTC 092221 1045AM CRTRM C

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: COLE CARMICHAEL - PTC 092221 1045AM CRTRM C

07/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: COLE CARMICHAEL - PTC 092221 1045AM CRTRM C

MOTION FILED

07/13/2021:MOTION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TIFFANY CARMICHAEL ~ BLANK

07/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TIFFANY CARMICHAEL ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLE CARMICHAEL ~ BLANK

07/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO COLE CARMICHAEL ~ BLANK

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED SRVD ON COLE CARMICHAEL (SUBST) 100121

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - AIAS SUMMONS ON COLE CARMICHAEL (SUBST SERVED TO KRYSTAL CARMICHAEL) 100121

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FILED AS TO TIFFANY CARMICHAEL ONLY - DEF AGREES TO PAY THE SUM OF $1621.20 BY PAYING INITIAL PYMNT OF $50.00 ON OR BEFORE 092421 AND MIN MO PYMNT OF $100.00 THEREAFTER ON THE 24TH OF EA MO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - NO ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: COLE CARMICHAEL - PTC 110821 AT 12:15PM CRTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TIFFANY CARMICHAEL - PTC 110821 AT 12:15PM CRTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number H 755284

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: COLE CARMICHAEL *BLANK*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TIFFANY CARMICHAEL *BLANK*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 795.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TIFFANY CARMICHAEL ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO COLE CARMICHAEL ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number H 745984

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC001758SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/6/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIA C PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williamson, David Earl