This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 04/20/2021 at 16:39:52 (UTC).

MERRILL, STEVEN VS CITY OF WILDWOOD

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 MERRILL, STEVEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF WILDWOOD. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERRILL, STEVEN

Defendant

CITY OF WILDWOOD

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO CITY OF WILDWOOD ON 033121

04/07/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO CITY OF WILDWOOD ON 033121

MEMORANDUM

03/25/2021:MEMORANDUM

ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

03/25/2021:ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

ADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

03/25/2021:ADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

03/25/2021:SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CITY OF WILDWOOD

03/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CITY OF WILDWOOD

REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, STEVEN MERRILL'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF WILDWOOD

03/22/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, STEVEN MERRILL'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF WILDWOOD

INTERROGATORY PLAINTIFF, STEVEN MERRILL'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF WILDWOOD

03/22/2021:INTERROGATORY PLAINTIFF, STEVEN MERRILL'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF WILDWOOD

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF, STEVEN MERILL'S FIRST SET OF REQEUSTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF WILDWOOD

03/22/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF, STEVEN MERILL'S FIRST SET OF REQEUSTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF WILDWOOD

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS service@krglawgroup.com

03/22/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS service@krglawgroup.com

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF WILWOOD ~ BLANK

03/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF WILWOOD ~ BLANK

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

03/22/2021:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

COVER SHEET

03/22/2021:COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO CITY OF WILDWOOD ON 033121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CITY OF WILDWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 727664

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, STEVEN MERRILL'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF WILDWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY PLAINTIFF, STEVEN MERRILL'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF WILDWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF, STEVEN MERILL'S FIRST SET OF REQEUSTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF WILDWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS service@krglawgroup.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CITY OF WILWOOD ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000219CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF WILDWOOD is a litigant