Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 02/20/2021 at 21:41:36 (UTC).

MELE, ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 MELE, ANTHONY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

MELE, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

DAY, SANDRA H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ANTHONY J MELE (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 012521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY DTD 012521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROP DTD 012521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST SIGNED BY DEPUTY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ANTHONY J. MELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT ROBIN WODZISZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPET TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 716937

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000090CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAY, SANDRA H.