Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 05/06/2021 at 16:20:42 (UTC).

MEB LOAN TRUST II US BANK NATI VS ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 MEB LOAN TRUST II US BANK NATI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEB LOAN TRUST II US BANK NATI

Defendants

HERNANDO CLERK OF COURT

HERNANDO COUNTY BOARD OF COUNT

HERNANDO COUNTY ANIMAL SERVICE

CAPELLI, MAURIZIO

ORTIZ, NORMA

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

PRUITT, THOMAS W

TENANT III UNKNOWN TENANT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NORMA ORTIZ

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF INDALICIO F

TENANT II UNKNOWN TENANT

ORTIZ, INDALICIO F

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MAURIZIO CAP

BRIGHT SMILE COLLECTIONS LLC

TENANT I UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT IV UNKNOWN TENANT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THOMAS W PRU

DANNA, NICHOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASSEL, GARY IRA

 

Court Documents

CONSENT - TO FORECLOSURE AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESSES -FILED BYD DEF, HERNANDO COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS' AND HERNANDO COUNTY ANIMAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT

04/26/2021:CONSENT - TO FORECLOSURE AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESSES -FILED BYD DEF, HERNANDO COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS' AND HERNANDO COUNTY ANIMAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT

ANSWER FILED BY BRIGHT SMILE COLLECTIONS LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BRIGHT SMILE FINANCING LLC

04/21/2021:ANSWER FILED BY BRIGHT SMILE COLLECTIONS LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BRIGHT SMILE FINANCING LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO HERNANDO COUNTY ANIMAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT ON 041321

04/19/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO HERNANDO COUNTY ANIMAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT ON 041321

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON TENANT IV/UNKNOWN TENANT

04/19/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON TENANT IV/UNKNOWN TENANT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON TENANT III/UNKNOWN TENANT

04/19/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON TENANT III/UNKNOWN TENANT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON TENANT II/UNKNOWN TENANT

04/19/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON TENANT II/UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NORMA ORTIZ

04/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NORMA ORTIZ

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TENANT IV/UNKNOWN TENANT

04/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TENANT IV/UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TENANT III/UNKNOWN TENANT

04/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TENANT III/UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TENANT II/ UNKNOWN TENANT

04/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TENANT II/ UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TENANT 1/ UNKNOWN TENANT

04/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TENANT 1/ UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MAURIZIO CAPELLI ~ BLANK

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MAURIZIO CAPELLI ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TENANT 111/ UNKNOWN TENANT ~ BLANK

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TENANT 111/ UNKNOWN TENANT ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TENANT 1/ UNKNOWN TENANT ~ BLANK

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TENANT 1/ UNKNOWN TENANT ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO INDALICIO F ORTIZ ~ BLANK

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO INDALICIO F ORTIZ ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC ~ BLANK

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF INDALICIO F ORTIZ ~ BLANK

04/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF INDALICIO F ORTIZ ~ BLANK

AFFIDAVIT

04/06/2021:AFFIDAVIT

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO APPOINT ELISOR, C. GRADY LEGETTE FOR DEF'S IN VOLUSIA COUNTY, FL -FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DOUG CHORVAT JR, CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HERNANDO COUNTY, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT - TO FORECLOSURE AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESSES -FILED BYD DEF, HERNANDO COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS' AND HERNANDO COUNTY ANIMAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $609.00 Receipt Number H 733296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $609.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY BRIGHT SMILE COLLECTIONS LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BRIGHT SMILE FINANCING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED BRIGHT SMILE COLLECTIONS LLC ON 041321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO HERNANDO COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMISSIONERS ON 041221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO HERNANDO COUNTY ANIMAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT ON 041321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO HERNANDO COUNTY CLERK OF COURT ON 041221

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HERNANDO COUNTY ANIMAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF INDALICIO F ORTIZ ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS Pleadings@gassellaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE 36746.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000263CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/6/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERNANDO COUNTY ANIMAL SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO COUNTY BOARD OF COUNT is a litigant

Latest cases where Meb Loan Trust Iii Us Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIGHT SMILE COLLECTIONS LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BRIGHT SMILES FINANCING is a litigant