This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 13:08:22 (UTC).

MCNULTY, ABIGAIL LYNN VS GRIFFIN, THOMAS J

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 MCNULTY, ABIGAIL LYNN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GRIFFIN, THOMAS J. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCNULTY, ABIGAIL LYNN

Defendant

GRIFFIN, THOMAS J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, FRANCIS ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

MEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT

01/19/2021:MEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 011921 AT 1:30 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR STEVEN A STRICKLAND ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

11/12/2020:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 011921 AT 1:30 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR STEVEN A STRICKLAND ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY RE GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY FILED BY DEF

11/05/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY RE GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF - CONTINUATION OF DEPO OF ABIGAIL LYNN MCNULTY ON 102220 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

10/07/2020:NOTICE OF - CONTINUATION OF DEPO OF ABIGAIL LYNN MCNULTY ON 102220 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

AMENDED NOTICE OF: OF EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.360 OF ABIGAIL LYNN MCNULTY W/ ASHVIN PATEL MD ON 100920AT 12:00 FILED BY DEF

09/17/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF: OF EXAMINATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.360 OF ABIGAIL LYNN MCNULTY W/ ASHVIN PATEL MD ON 100920AT 12:00 FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF - VIDEOTAPING COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAM ON 100920 AT 11:00 BEFORE ASHVIN PATEL MD FILED BY PLNTF

08/06/2020:NOTICE OF - VIDEOTAPING COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAM ON 100920 AT 11:00 BEFORE ASHVIN PATEL MD FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY

07/02/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY DEF

06/26/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF FRANK A MILLER ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS fmiller@cagmil.com

06/26/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF FRANK A MILLER ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS fmiller@cagmil.com

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON THOMAS J GRIFFIN 061820

06/20/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON THOMAS J GRIFFIN 061820

ADMIN ORDER A-2020-25 DTD 050720

05/27/2020:ADMIN ORDER A-2020-25 DTD 050720

SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

05/27/2020:SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

05/27/2020:ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

MTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

05/27/2020:MTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THOMAS GRIFFIN

05/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THOMAS GRIFFIN

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT THOMAS J GRIFFIN

05/20/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT THOMAS J GRIFFIN

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/20/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

05/20/2020:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - CHARGING LIEN AND INTENT TO ENFORCE FILED BY WHITTEL & MELTON LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLNTF FILED BY JASON MELTON ESQ, CHRSTOPHER KLEMAWESCH ESQ AND LAW OFFICES OF WHITTEL & MELTON LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLETION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS RPT ON 061820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN TO STRIKE - THE COURT RESERVES RULING UNTIL COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY DTD 123020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - COMPLIANCE W/ RULE 1.720 FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 011921 AT 1:30 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR STEVEN A STRICKLAND ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY RE GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - CONTINUATION OF DEPO OF ABIGAIL LYNN MCNULTY ON 102220 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THOMAS J GRIFFIN ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT THOMAS J GRIFFIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, THOMAS J GRIFFIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000440CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER, FRANCIS ANTHONY