This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/02/2021 at 04:08:45 (UTC).

MCMILLION, KATHRYNE Et Al VS HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 MCMILLION, KATHRYNE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCMILLION, STEPHAN

MCMILLION, KATHRYNE

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAKRIS, DEAN

Defendant Attorney

CULLETON, SARAH KATE

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE FROM HERITAGE INSURANCE DATED 101521

10/19/2021:CORRESPONDENCE FROM HERITAGE INSURANCE DATED 101521

ORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEF'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PL'S DISCOVERY=GRANTED DTD 101821

10/18/2021:ORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEF'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PL'S DISCOVERY=GRANTED DTD 101821

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY (SECOND) FILED BY DEF

10/13/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY (SECOND) FILED BY DEF

REPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLNTFS

10/06/2021:REPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLNTFS

ORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEFS MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY IS GRANTED - ON OR BEFORE 101321 DTD 092721

09/27/2021:ORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEFS MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY IS GRANTED - ON OR BEFORE 101321 DTD 092721

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY FILED BY DEF

09/13/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY FILED BY DEF

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

09/07/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CORRESPONDENCE DATED 081921 FROM SARAH CULLETON ESQ RE PROPOSED ORDER

08/20/2021:CORRESPONDENCE DATED 081921 FROM SARAH CULLETON ESQ RE PROPOSED ORDER

ORDER FILED ON DEF'S AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPSOND TO PLNTF'S COMPLAINT (DEF HAS UNTIL 090621)=GRANTED -DTD 081921

08/20/2021:ORDER FILED ON DEF'S AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPSOND TO PLNTF'S COMPLAINT (DEF HAS UNTIL 090621)=GRANTED -DTD 081921

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF

08/17/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SARAH CULLETON ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL DESIG sculleton@heritagepci.com

08/13/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SARAH CULLETON ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL DESIG sculleton@heritagepci.com

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 072821 (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTFS

07/28/2021:NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 072821 (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTFS

ADMIN NOTICE

07/14/2021:ADMIN NOTICE

HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM

07/14/2021:HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

07/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

07/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

NOTICE OF SERVICE

07/07/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/07/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM HERITAGE INSURANCE DATED 101521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEF'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PL'S DISCOVERY=GRANTED DTD 101821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY (SECOND) FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLNTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED (AGREED) ON DEFS MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY IS GRANTED - ON OR BEFORE 101321 DTD 092721

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE DATED 081921 FROM SARAH CULLETON ESQ RE PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON DEF'S AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPSOND TO PLNTF'S COMPLAINT (DEF HAS UNTIL 090621)=GRANTED -DTD 081921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000551CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/7/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEAN MAKRIS, ESQ