This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/07/2022 at 16:22:14 (UTC).

MCKEEVER, DALTON EDWARD JR Et Al VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 MCKEEVER, DALTON EDWARD JR filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCKEEVER, DALTON EDWARD JR

MCKEEVER, MARJORIE ELIZABETH

Defendants

RIGGS, PATRICK ISAAC

RANEYS TRUCK PARTS INC

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DICAMPLI, CARL JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE AND ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

11/28/2022:HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE AND ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

NOTICE RE COURTHOUSE PARKING FOR TRIALS AND IN PERSON HEARINGS

11/28/2022:NOTICE RE COURTHOUSE PARKING FOR TRIALS AND IN PERSON HEARINGS

OFFICE PERSONNEL NOTICE

11/28/2022:OFFICE PERSONNEL NOTICE

EXHIBITS - "A"

11/17/2022:EXHIBITS - "A"

NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT "A" TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT

11/17/2022:NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT "A" TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC

11/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS

11/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/15/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -BLANK-

11/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -BLANK-

SUMMONS ISSUED RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC -BLANK-

11/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC -BLANK-

SUMMONS ISSUED PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS -BLANK-

11/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS -BLANK-

PL MARJORIE ELIZABETH MCKEEVER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/15/2022:PL MARJORIE ELIZABETH MCKEEVER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PL MARJORIE ELIZABETH MCKEEVER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC

11/15/2022:PL MARJORIE ELIZABETH MCKEEVER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC

PL MARJORIE ELIZABETH MCKEEVER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS

11/15/2022:PL MARJORIE ELIZABETH MCKEEVER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS

PL DALTON EDWARD MCKEEVER JR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/15/2022:PL DALTON EDWARD MCKEEVER JR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PL DALTON EDWARD MCKEEVER JR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC

11/15/2022:PL DALTON EDWARD MCKEEVER JR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC

PL DALTON EDWARD MCKEEVER JR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS

11/15/2022:PL DALTON EDWARD MCKEEVER JR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHIGH PRIORITY NOTICE AND ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RE COURTHOUSE PARKING FOR TRIALS AND IN PERSON HEARINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOFFICE PERSONNEL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS - "A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT "A" TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number H 822241

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPL DALTON EDWARD MCKEEVER JR REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPL DALTON EDWARD MCKEEVER JR REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPL DALTON EDWARD MCKEEVER JR REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO RANEY'S TRUCK PARTS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PATRICK ISAAC RIGGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase 272022CA001125CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANEYS TRUCK PARTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DICAMPLI, CARL