This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 19:14:01 (UTC).

MARTINO, ROGER VS HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 MARTINO, ROGER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINO, ROGER

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

 

Court Documents

EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE FROM YANET CORDOVA RE AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFS MTN FOR EXT OF TIME

08/05/2020:EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE FROM YANET CORDOVA RE AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFS MTN FOR EXT OF TIME

ORDER FILED - DEFS MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS GRANTED - ON OR BEFORE 081120 DTD 080420

08/05/2020:ORDER FILED - DEFS MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS GRANTED - ON OR BEFORE 081120 DTD 080420

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF

07/22/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID BARRERA ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS dbarrera@heritagepci.com

07/13/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID BARRERA ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS dbarrera@heritagepci.com

ADMIN ORDER A-2020-25 DTD 050720

05/27/2020:ADMIN ORDER A-2020-25 DTD 050720

SUPREMEN COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

05/27/2020:SUPREMEN COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

05/27/2020:ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

ADMIN ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 022820 DTD 022820

05/27/2020:ADMIN ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 022820 DTD 022820

MTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

05/27/2020:MTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

05/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/21/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

INTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

05/21/2020:INTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

05/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

05/21/2020:COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

COVER SHEET

05/21/2020:COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL CORRESPONDENCE FROM YANET CORDOVA RE AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFS MTN FOR EXT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED - DEFS MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS GRANTED - ON OR BEFORE 081120 DTD 080420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID BARRERA ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS dbarrera@heritagepci.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN ORDER A-2020-25 DTD 050720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREMEN COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 022820 DTD 022820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 683061

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000444CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant