This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 12:43:00 (UTC).

MARTIN, DAVID MURRAY, WALKER, NICOLE E Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 MARTIN, DAVID MURRAY, WALKER, NICOLE E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

WALKER, NICOLE E

Decedent

MARTIN, DAVID MURRAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

JONAS, STEVEN KEITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY PETITIONER NICOLE WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketOBJECTION TO PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketOBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketORDER FILED DECLARING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DTD 061720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDISPUTING VALIDITY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF DAVID MURRAY MARTIN FROM TIMOTHY D MARTIN AND KAYLA CAST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 683662

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY DAVID M MARTIN (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH DAVID MURRAY MARTIN (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE WAIVER OF NOTICE & BOND - NICOLE WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (TESTATE FLORIDA RESIDENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP000537CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONAS, STEVEN KEITH