This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 13:47:02 (UTC).

MARIANI, RONNIE VS PETERSON, MELISSA ANN

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 MARIANI, RONNIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PETERSON, MELISSA ANN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIANI, RONNIE

Defendant

PETERSON, MELISSA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VRASPIR, TODD WILLARD

Defendant Attorney

SHELTON, ADAM CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

09/07/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (FIFTH - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

09/07/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (FIFTH - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

NOTICE NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES AND REQUEST FOR COPIES -FILED BY PLNTF

04/30/2021:NOTICE NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES AND REQUEST FOR COPIES -FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MELISSA ANN PETERSON ON 042121 AT 11:00 OR FOLLOWING DEPO OF RONNIE MARIANI VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTF

04/15/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MELISSA ANN PETERSON ON 042121 AT 11:00 OR FOLLOWING DEPO OF RONNIE MARIANI VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF RONNIE MARIANI ON 042121 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

04/12/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF RONNIE MARIANI ON 042121 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

11/10/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO DEFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

10/23/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO DEFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF

08/11/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF

08/11/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

08/04/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

07/16/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

07/16/2020:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

07/16/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

REPLY or ANSWER TO DEFS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLNTF

07/16/2020:REPLY or ANSWER TO DEFS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLNTF

SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA NO. AOSC20-23 AMENDMENT 3 (1)

06/12/2020:SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA NO. AOSC20-23 AMENDMENT 3 (1)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MELISSA ANN PETERSON ~ BLANK

06/09/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MELISSA ANN PETERSON ~ BLANK

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

06/09/2020:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

COVER SHEET

06/09/2020:COVER SHEET

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (FIFTH - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES AND REQUEST FOR COPIES -FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (FOURTH) -FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MELISSA ANN PETERSON ON 042121 AT 11:00 OR FOLLOWING DEPO OF RONNIE MARIANI VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEPUTY J MATHIS ON 042121 AT 1:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF RONNIE MARIANI ON 042121 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (THIRD - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA NO. AOSC20-23 AMENDMENT 3 (1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MELISSA ANN PETERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MELISSA ANN PETERSON ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 685453

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000493CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VRASPIR , TODD WILLARD