This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/14/2019 at 13:15:46 (UTC).

MANZANO-HILL, ROBERT Et Al VS FRYE, ANN LOUISE

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 MANZANO-HILL, ROBERT filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against FRYE, ANN LOUISE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE JOHN J HILL JR TRUST

MANZANO-HILL, ROBERT

Defendant

FRYE, ANN LOUISE

Not Classified By Court

FRYE, ANN L

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

05/07/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO ANN LOUISE FRYE - CLERK DEFAULT

05/20/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED TO ANN LOUISE FRYE - CLERK DEFAULT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON ANN LOUISE FRYE ON 05/08/2019

05/13/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON ANN LOUISE FRYE ON 05/08/2019

ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 050619

05/07/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 050619

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENDANT ANN LOUISE FRYE

05/06/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENDANT ANN LOUISE FRYE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ANN LOUISE FRYE

05/03/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ANN LOUISE FRYE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON ANN LOUISE FRYE 042519

04/29/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON ANN LOUISE FRYE 042519

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL ISSUED FOR ANN LOUISE FRYE

04/22/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL ISSUED FOR ANN LOUISE FRYE

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

04/22/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

04/22/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PETITION FOR EVICTION FOR ANN LOUISE FRYE

04/22/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION FOR ANN LOUISE FRYE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - DTD 050619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 625143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENDANT ANN LOUISE FRYE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT ANN LOUISE FRYE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON ANN LOUISE FRYE 042519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL ISSUED FOR ANN LOUISE FRYE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION FOR ANN LOUISE FRYE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 622434

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Case 272019CC000539CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less