Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 13:17:54 (UTC).

MANGAL, ARIF VS LONG, RANDY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 MANGAL, ARIF filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LONG, RANDY. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANGAL, ARIF

Defendants

SHONE, LAURIE

LONG, RANDY

 

Court Documents

COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY ADMISSION; JUDGMENT WILL BE PREPARDED BY COURT; EVICTION GRANTED, SIGNED IN COURT

04/04/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY ADMISSION; JUDGMENT WILL BE PREPARDED BY COURT; EVICTION GRANTED, SIGNED IN COURT

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AGAINST RANDY LONG AND LAURIE SHONE

04/04/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AGAINST RANDY LONG AND LAURIE SHONE

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY- AGAINST RANDY LONG AND LAURIE SHONE

04/04/2019:JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY- AGAINST RANDY LONG AND LAURIE SHONE

NOTICE OF FINAL EVICTION HEARING ON APRIL 4, 2019 @ 2:30 PM

03/27/2019:NOTICE OF FINAL EVICTION HEARING ON APRIL 4, 2019 @ 2:30 PM

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AGAINST RANDY LONG AND LAURIE SHONE

03/26/2019:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AGAINST RANDY LONG AND LAURIE SHONE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/20/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON LAURIE SHONE 031819

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON LAURIE SHONE 031819

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON RANDY LONG (SUBST SERVED TO LAURIE SHONE) 031819

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON RANDY LONG (SUBST SERVED TO LAURIE SHONE) 031819

RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT, LAURIE SHONE

03/19/2019:RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT, LAURIE SHONE

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

03/15/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT LAURIE SHORE

03/15/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT LAURIE SHORE

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT RANDY LONG

03/15/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT RANDY LONG

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE

03/15/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LAURIE SHORE (PL)

03/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LAURIE SHORE (PL)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RANDY LONG(PL)

03/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RANDY LONG(PL)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY ADMISSION; JUDGMENT WILL BE PREPARDED BY COURT; EVICTION GRANTED, SIGNED IN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AGAINST RANDY LONG AND LAURIE SHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY- AGAINST RANDY LONG AND LAURIE SHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 619900

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Assessment 3 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FINAL EVICTION HEARING ON APRIL 4, 2019 @ 2:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AGAINST RANDY LONG AND LAURIE SHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RANDY LONG(PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number H 616409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $219.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $34.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Case 272019CC000385CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less