This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 12/20/2019 at 16:16:02 (UTC).

MANCUSO, STEVEN VS BASS, BEVERLY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 MANCUSO, STEVEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BASS, BEVERLY. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANCUSO, STEVEN

Defendants

BASS, BEVERLY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

BASS, SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHAAP, MARSHALL

 

Court Documents

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF STEVEN MANCUSO ON 072820 AT 10:30 VIA ZOOM FILE DBY DEFS BASS

07/01/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF STEVEN MANCUSO ON 072820 AT 10:30 VIA ZOOM FILE DBY DEFS BASS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/18/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/18/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/18/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF - DISCLOSURE FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/18/2020:NOTICE OF - DISCLOSURE FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/18/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/18/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

02/18/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

09/14/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT)

09/01/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT)

AMENDED - RESPONSE TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLNTF

07/31/2020:AMENDED - RESPONSE TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED ON DEFS SUSAN BASS AND BEVERLY BASS'S MTN TO COMPEL PLNTFS DISCOVERY RESPONSES IS GRANTED - W/I 15 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 061020

06/10/2020:ORDER FILED ON DEFS SUSAN BASS AND BEVERLY BASS'S MTN TO COMPEL PLNTFS DISCOVERY RESPONSES IS GRANTED - W/I 15 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 061020

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO (SEE DOCUMENT FILED BY DEFS, BASS

04/03/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO (SEE DOCUMENT FILED BY DEFS, BASS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (FIRST) OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, SUSAN BASS

04/02/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (FIRST) OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, SUSAN BASS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SUSAN BASS

12/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SUSAN BASS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

12/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BEVERLY BASS

12/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BEVERLY BASS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SUSAN BASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BEVERLY BASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number H 657710

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF SUSAN BASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF GEICO GENERAL INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF BEVERLY BASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF SUSAN BASS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF SUSAN BASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF GEICO GENERAL INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF BEVERLY BASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED SUSAN BASS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BEVERLY BASS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001341CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHAAP , MARSHALL