Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/01/2021 at 21:16:21 (UTC).

MAKINEY, EARL ROBERT, MAKINEY, JUDITH ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 MAKINEY, EARL ROBERT, MAKINEY, JUDITH ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

MAKINEY, EARL ROBERT

Not Classified By Court

MAKINEY, JUDITH ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Classified By Court Attorney

HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF EARL R MAKINEY (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCOPY REQUEST COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $3.50 Receipt Number H 731081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $3.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED ON PETITION TO TRANSFER LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DTD 040921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH EARL ROBERT MAKINEY (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 729148

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED TO TRANSFER LAST WILLA ND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH EARL ROBERT MAKINEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY EARL R. MAKINEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT JUDITH ANN MAKINEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000455CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD