This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/05/2022 at 16:33:57 (UTC).

MAGNIFICO, THERESA A VS CONFIDENCE TRUCKING WC LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 MAGNIFICO, THERESA A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CONFIDENCE TRUCKING WC LLC. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD E and SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGNIFICO, THERESA A

Defendants

MAUGER, ROBERT E JR

CONFIDENCE TRUCKING WC LLC

ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Not Classified By Court

MAUGER, ROBERT E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWMAN, STEPHANIE ANNE

Defendant Attorney

ACCARDI, WENDY BRAUSE

 

Court Documents

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 061622

06/22/2022:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 061622

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC 061322

06/15/2022:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC 061322

SCHEDULING/HEARING MEMORANDUM DTD 060622

06/13/2022:SCHEDULING/HEARING MEMORANDUM DTD 060622

ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE (AMENDED)

06/13/2022:ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE (AMENDED)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEF CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC FILED BY PLNTF

06/13/2022:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEF CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC FILED BY PLNTF

06/13/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (INITIAL) TO DEF CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC FILED BY PLNTF

06/13/2022:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (INITIAL) TO DEF CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EMPLOYMENT INTERROGS TO DEF CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC FILED BY PLNTF

06/13/2022:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EMPLOYMENT INTERROGS TO DEF CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC /REQUEST FOR INSPECTION OF VEHICLE DIRECTED TO DEF ROBERT E MAUGER JR AKA ROBERT E MAUGER FILED BY PLNTF

06/13/2022:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC /REQUEST FOR INSPECTION OF VEHICLE DIRECTED TO DEF ROBERT E MAUGER JR AKA ROBERT E MAUGER FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF ROBERT E MAUGER JR AKA ROBERT E MAUGER FILED BY PLNTF

06/13/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF ROBERT E MAUGER JR AKA ROBERT E MAUGER FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF ROBERT E MAUGER JR AKA ROBERT E MAUGER FILED BY PLNTF

06/13/2022:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF ROBERT E MAUGER JR AKA ROBERT E MAUGER FILED BY PLNTF

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

06/08/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC

06/08/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ROBERT E MAUGER JR

06/08/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ROBERT E MAUGER JR

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

06/06/2022:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC ~ BLANK

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT E MAUGER JR ~ BLANK

06/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT E MAUGER JR ~ BLANK

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEF ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketREPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEF ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF AUTOMOBILE INTERROGS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF WENDY B ACCARDI AS COUNSEL FOR DEF ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND EMAIL DESIG TAMPALEGAL@ALLSTATE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 061622

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC 061322

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING/HEARING MEMORANDUM DTD 060622

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number H 796591

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CONFIDENCE TRUCKING W/C LLC ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT E MAUGER JR ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCase 272022CA000542CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONFIDENCE TRUCKING WC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WENDY B ACCARDI, ESQ