This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/13/2021 at 23:38:22 (UTC).

M AND T BANK VS GUSLER, MARY T

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 M AND T BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUSLER, MARY T. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE, SCAGLIONE, DONALD E and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M AND T BANK

Defendant

GUSLER, MARY T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUMBERT, PAUL A

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/12/2019:COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

09/12/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARY T GUSLER~ BLANK

09/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARY T GUSLER~ BLANK

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

09/12/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MARY T GUSLER

09/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MARY T GUSLER

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON MARY T GUSLER

12/12/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON MARY T GUSLER

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLNTF - PAUL A HUMBERT ESQ IN PLACE OF RALPH S MARCADIS ESQ

09/21/2020:MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLNTF - PAUL A HUMBERT ESQ IN PLACE OF RALPH S MARCADIS ESQ

ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - ALIAS SUMMONS ON MARY GUSLER (BLANK)

09/21/2020:ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - ALIAS SUMMONS ON MARY GUSLER (BLANK)

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARY GUSLER

09/22/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARY GUSLER

ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED SRVD ON MARY GUSLER (SUBST SERVED TO TIM GUSLER) 111020

12/14/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED SRVD ON MARY GUSLER (SUBST SERVED TO TIM GUSLER) 111020

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

12/16/2020:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST MARY GUSLER AND DEFAULT (BLANK)

12/16/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST MARY GUSLER AND DEFAULT (BLANK)

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST MARY GUSLER

12/21/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST MARY GUSLER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST MARY GUSLER (EX-PARTE) FILED BY PLNTF

02/24/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST MARY GUSLER (EX-PARTE) FILED BY PLNTF

JUDGMENT FILED - DEFAULT FJ - PLNTF RECOVER FROM DEF THE SUM OF $30,827 WHICH SHALL BEAR INT AT THE POST-JUDMENT STAT RATE, PRESENTLY 4.81% PER ANNUM FOR WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE DTD 030321

03/05/2021:JUDGMENT FILED - DEFAULT FJ - PLNTF RECOVER FROM DEF THE SUM OF $30,827 WHICH SHALL BEAR INT AT THE POST-JUDMENT STAT RATE, PRESENTLY 4.81% PER ANNUM FOR WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE DTD 030321

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED TO MARY T. GUSLER ON 051721

05/17/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED TO MARY T. GUSLER ON 051721

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO SCHED ON 062421 AT 1:20PM

06/10/2021:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO SCHED ON 062421 AT 1:20PM

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO SCHED ON 062421 AT 1:20PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED TO MARY T. GUSLER ON 051721

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - DEFAULT FJ - PLNTF RECOVER FROM DEF THE SUM OF $30,827 WHICH SHALL BEAR INT AT THE POST-JUDMENT STAT RATE, PRESENTLY 4.81% PER ANNUM FOR WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE DTD 030321

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST MARY GUSLER (EX-PARTE) FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST MARY GUSLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST MARY GUSLER AND DEFAULT (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED SRVD ON MARY GUSLER (SUBST SERVED TO TIM GUSLER) 111020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketJudge: VERGARA , PAMELA Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MARY T GUSLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 645746

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MARY T GUSLER~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001053CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M AND T BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Humbert, Paul A