This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 15:59:00 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS VILLALBA, MARLENE

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VILLALBA, MARLENE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT E and HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

VILLALBA, MARLENE

Spring Hill, FL 34608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/22/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,365.64

06/22/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,365.64

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS MRLENE VILLALBA - BLANK

06/22/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS MRLENE VILLALBA - BLANK

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

06/22/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MARLENE VILLALBA - PTC 092921 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

06/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MARLENE VILLALBA - PTC 092921 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON MARLENE VILLALBA 063021 - PTC 092921 AT 9:00AM CRTRM B

07/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON MARLENE VILLALBA 063021 - PTC 092921 AT 9:00AM CRTRM B

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 FILED BY PLNTF

09/28/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS COUNSEL MTN TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 IS GRANTED DTD 092921

09/29/2021:ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS COUNSEL MTN TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 IS GRANTED DTD 092921

COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY ADMISSION

09/29/2021:COURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY ADMISSION

AFFIDAVIT OF AUTHORIZED AGENT

10/12/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF AUTHORIZED AGENT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

10/12/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

MOTION FILED FOR ENTRY OF FJ

10/12/2021:MOTION FILED FOR ENTRY OF FJ

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/12/2021:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

JUDGMENT FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT PL SHALL RECOVER FROM DEF THE PRINC SUM OF $1365.64 W/COSTS OF $245, WHICH SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT THE RATE SET BY F.S., UNTIL PD FOR WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE -DTD 101821

10/19/2021:JUDGMENT FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT PL SHALL RECOVER FROM DEF THE PRINC SUM OF $1365.64 W/COSTS OF $245, WHICH SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT THE RATE SET BY F.S., UNTIL PD FOR WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE -DTD 101821

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT PL SHALL RECOVER FROM DEF THE PRINC SUM OF $1365.64 W/COSTS OF $245, WHICH SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT THE RATE SET BY F.S., UNTIL PD FOR WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE -DTD 101821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED FOR ENTRY OF FJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF AUTHORIZED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF BY ADMISSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON PLNTFS COUNSEL MTN TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 IS GRANTED DTD 092921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON MARLENE VILLALBA 063021 - PTC 092921 AT 9:00AM CRTRM B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MARLENE VILLALBA - PTC 092921 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 743270

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS MRLENE VILLALBA - BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,365.64

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC001556SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B