This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/16/2021 at 04:40:16 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS GARTLAND, KATHLEEN

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GARTLAND, KATHLEEN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GARTLAND, KATHLEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOTANE, TROY R

HINES, MICHELLE KIM

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KATHLEEN GARTLAND (SUBST SERVED TO OLIVIA GARTLAND) 100721

10/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KATHLEEN GARTLAND (SUBST SERVED TO OLIVIA GARTLAND) 100721

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KATHLEEN GARTLAND - PTC 111021 AT 9:30 CRTRM C

09/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KATHLEEN GARTLAND - PTC 111021 AT 9:30 CRTRM C

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO KATHLEEN GARTLAND ~ BLANK*

09/13/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO KATHLEEN GARTLAND ~ BLANK*

COVER SHEET

09/13/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KATHLEEN GARTLAND (SUBST SERVED TO OLIVIA GARTLAND) 100721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KATHLEEN GARTLAND - PTC 111021 AT 9:30 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 755339

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO KATHLEEN GARTLAND ~ BLANK*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 1255.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC002395SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R