This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 15:59:13 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS ETIENNE, KWAMI EMEKA

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ETIENNE, KWAMI EMEKA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT E and HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ETIENNE, KWAMI EMEKA

Spring Hill, FL 34609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

Defendant Attorney

SINGLETON, RYAN NORMAN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/22/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,9.6.76

06/22/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,9.6.76

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS KWAMI ETIENNE - BLANK

06/22/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS KWAMI ETIENNE - BLANK

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

06/22/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KWAMI ETIENNE - PTC 092921 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

06/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KWAMI ETIENNE - PTC 092921 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KWAMI ETIENNE (SUBST) 062921 - PTC 092921 9:00AM CRTRM B

06/30/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KWAMI ETIENNE (SUBST) 062921 - PTC 092921 9:00AM CRTRM B

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF RYAN SINGLETON, ESQ. AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEF, AND DESIG OF E-MAIL debtservice@hollandlaw.com

09/16/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF RYAN SINGLETON, ESQ. AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEF, AND DESIG OF E-MAIL debtservice@hollandlaw.com

NOTICE OF - OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT -FILED BY DEF

09/20/2021:NOTICE OF - OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT -FILED BY DEF

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 092921 AT 9AM -FILED BY DEF

09/22/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 092921 AT 9AM -FILED BY DEF

ORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 IS GRANTED DTD 092421

09/24/2021:ORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 IS GRANTED DTD 092421

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 FILED BY PLNTF

09/28/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 FILED BY PLNTF

COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

09/29/2021:COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS COUNSEL MTN TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT PTC ON 092921 IS GRANTED DTD 092921

09/29/2021:ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS COUNSEL MTN TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT PTC ON 092921 IS GRANTED DTD 092921

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON PLNTFS COUNSEL MTN TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT PTC ON 092921 IS GRANTED DTD 092921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY COUNSEL FOR PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 092921 AT 9:00 IS GRANTED DTD 092421

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT PTC ON 092921 AT 9AM -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF RYAN SINGLETON, ESQ. AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEF, AND DESIG OF E-MAIL debtservice@hollandlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KWAMI ETIENNE (SUBST) 062921 - PTC 092921 9:00AM CRTRM B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KWAMI ETIENNE - PTC 092921 AT 9:00 CRTRM B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 743272

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS KWAMI ETIENNE - BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $1906.76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC001558SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B