This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 18:21:37 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS CAPOCCETTA, LUIGI

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAPOCCETTA, LUIGI. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CAPOCCETTA, LUIGI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES, MICHELLE KIM

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON LUIGI CAPOCCETTA - PTC 110920 AT 10:45 CRTRM C

10/07/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON LUIGI CAPOCCETTA - PTC 110920 AT 10:45 CRTRM C

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LUIGI CAPOCCETTA -PTC 110920 AT 10:45 CRTRM C

10/02/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LUIGI CAPOCCETTA -PTC 110920 AT 10:45 CRTRM C

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,978.12

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,978.12

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS LUIGI CAPOCCETTA - BLANK

09/21/2020:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS LUIGI CAPOCCETTA - BLANK

COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON LUIGI CAPOCCETTA - PTC 110920 AT 10:45 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LUIGI CAPOCCETTA -PTC 110920 AT 10:45 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 699644

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS LUIGI CAPOCCETTA - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,978.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020SC001917SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less