Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/14/2021 at 02:52:57 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS BERRIOS, JAMES

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BERRIOS, JAMES. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BERRIOS, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JAMES BERRIOS 041521

04/16/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JAMES BERRIOS 041521

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JAMES BERRIOS - PTC ON 060721 AT 9:15AM CRTRM B

04/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JAMES BERRIOS - PTC ON 060721 AT 9:15AM CRTRM B

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,799.14

03/31/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,799.14

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS JAMES BERRIOS - BLANK

03/31/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS JAMES BERRIOS - BLANK

COVER SHEET

03/31/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JAMES BERRIOS 041521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JAMES BERRIOS - PTC ON 060721 AT 9:15AM CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 729391

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS JAMES BERRIOS - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,799.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC000731SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL