This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 12/20/2019 at 16:15:48 (UTC).

LOTT, FRANCES VS AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMP Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 LOTT, FRANCES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOTT, FRANCES

Defendants

KNOWLES, ROBERT

AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMP

KNOWLES, JAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFITH, ANTHONY JAMES

 

Court Documents

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEFS, KNOWLES FILED BY PLNTF

03/03/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEFS, KNOWLES FILED BY PLNTF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

03/03/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

03/03/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEFS, KNOWLES FILED BY PLNTF

03/03/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEFS, KNOWLES FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEFS, JAN KNOWES AND ROBERT KNOWLES

03/03/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEFS, JAN KNOWES AND ROBERT KNOWLES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

03/06/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SECOND) - RC: HUMANA INC AND RC: AMERIGROUP CORPORATION FILED BY DEF, AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

03/18/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SECOND) - RC: HUMANA INC AND RC: AMERIGROUP CORPORATION FILED BY DEF, AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFS, JAN KNOWLES AND ROBERT KNOWLES (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

03/24/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFS, JAN KNOWLES AND ROBERT KNOWLES (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

03/27/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

03/31/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FOURTH) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

04/06/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FOURTH) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - RC: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

04/06/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - RC: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

ORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN TO COMPEL IS DENIED AS MOOT DTD 040220

04/02/2020:ORDER FILED ON DEFS MTN TO COMPEL IS DENIED AS MOOT DTD 040220

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF (THIRD) FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

03/31/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF (THIRD) FILED BY DEFS, KNOWLES

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, ROBERT KNOWLES ON 040920 FILED BY PLNTF

04/09/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, ROBERT KNOWLES ON 040920 FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, JAN KNOWLES ON 040920 FILED BY PLNTF

04/09/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, JAN KNOWLES ON 040920 FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 040920 FILED BY PLNTF

04/09/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 040920 FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF FRANCES LOTT ON 062220 AT 10:00

04/07/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF FRANCES LOTT ON 062220 AT 10:00

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY 120619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: - ROBERT KNOWLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: - JAN KNOWLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: - AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEF, ROBERT KNOWLES FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEF, JAN KNOWLES FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSRUANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF, ROBERT KNOWLES FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF, JAN KNOWLES FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number H 658388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ROBERT KNOWLES (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JAN KNOWLES (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001355CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Club South Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY J GRIFFITH, ESQ