This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 13:25:15 (UTC).

LORREY APARTMENTS, LLC VS MARVEL-MARTINEZ, MICHELE MARIE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 LORREY APARTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MARVEL-MARTINEZ, MICHELE MARIE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORREY APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

MARVEL-MARTINEZ, MICHELE MARIE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION FOR MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ (PL)

10/01/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION FOR MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ (PL)

DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION GRANTED - DTD 100120

10/01/2020:DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION GRANTED - DTD 100120

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ

09/29/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY LORREY APARTMENTS, LLC

09/29/2020:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY LORREY APARTMENTS, LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ POSTED RESIDENTIAL - 092120

09/23/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ POSTED RESIDENTIAL - 092120

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/17/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

09/17/2020:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

09/17/2020:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

09/17/2020:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ (PL)

09/17/2020:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ (PL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 701032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION FOR MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION GRANTED - DTD 100120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY LORREY APARTMENTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ POSTED RESIDENTIAL - 092120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL MICHELE MARIE MARVEL-MARTINEZ (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 699214

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CC000801CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less