Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:37:42 (UTC).

LODER, NICHOLAS VS TORRES, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 LODER, NICHOLAS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against TORRES, STEVEN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and PAMELA VERGARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

PAMELA VERGARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LODER, NICHOLAS

Respondent

TORRES, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BROWN, JAMES MARTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON STEVEN TORRES ON 030121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 4/7/2021 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JAMES BROWN OBO RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY ORDER - DOM VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 3/10/2021 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000372DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, JAMES MARTIN