Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 06/07/2019 at 13:15:39 (UTC).

LOCKE, LYDIA VS LOCKE, JASON T Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 LOCKE, LYDIA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LOCKE, JASON T. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOCKE, LYDIA

Defendants

ROSARIO LOCKE, KIMBERLY

LOCKE, JASON T

Not Classified By Court

LOCKE, MANDY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL*

05/21/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL*

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON JASON T LOCKE 051619

05/17/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON JASON T LOCKE 051619

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON KIMBERLY ROSARIO LOCKE 051619

05/17/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON KIMBERLY ROSARIO LOCKE 051619

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/14/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR JASON T LOCKE

05/14/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR JASON T LOCKE

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KIMBERLY ROSARIO LOCKE

05/14/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KIMBERLY ROSARIO LOCKE

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

05/14/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH 3 DAY NOTICE

05/14/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH 3 DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TO JASON T LOCKE

05/14/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TO JASON T LOCKE

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TO KIMBERLY ROSARIO LOCKE

05/14/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TO KIMBERLY ROSARIO LOCKE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON JASON T LOCKE 051619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON KIMBERLY ROSARIO LOCKE 051619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR JASON T LOCKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KIMBERLY ROSARIO LOCKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH 3 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TO JASON T LOCKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TO KIMBERLY ROSARIO LOCKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number H 626080

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $219.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Case 272019CC000635CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less