This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/21/2021 at 21:09:18 (UTC).

LINK, KAREN ANN, LINK, SCOTT B Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 LINK, KAREN ANN, LINK, SCOTT B was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

LINK, SCOTT B

Decedent

LINK, KAREN ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Decedent Attorney

GERMANN, AMANDA J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP DTD 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $9.00 Receipt Number H 744034

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH KAREN ANN LINK (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH KAREN ANN LINK (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 742964

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH EDWARD HARMON LINK (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000823CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERMANN, AMANDA J.