This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 23:20:39 (UTC).

LETTERMAN, FLORENCE JOYCE VS LETTERMAN, DAVID RAY

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 LETTERMAN, FLORENCE JOYCE filed an Other lawsuit against LETTERMAN, DAVID RAY. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LETTERMAN, FLORENCE JOYCE

Defendant

LETTERMAN, DAVID RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

VRASPIR, TODD WILLARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTEROGS FILED BY PLNTF

07/16/2021:NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTEROGS FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

07/16/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENS -FILED BY PLNTF

04/16/2021:RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENS -FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) - FILED BY DEF

04/08/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) - FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST) - FILED BY DEF

04/08/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST) - FILED BY DEF

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - FILED BY DEF

04/08/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF TODD W. VRASPIR, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEF, DAVID RAY LETTERMAN todd@vraspirlaw.com

04/08/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF TODD W. VRASPIR, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEF, DAVID RAY LETTERMAN todd@vraspirlaw.com

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DAVID RAY LETTERMAN

03/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DAVID RAY LETTERMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAVID RAY LETTERMAN ~ BLANK

03/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAVID RAY LETTERMAN ~ BLANK

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS*

03/23/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS*

COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

03/23/2021:COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

COVER SHEET

03/23/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTEROGS FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENS -FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) - FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST) - FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF TODD W. VRASPIR, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEF, DAVID RAY LETTERMAN todd@vraspirlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DAVID RAY LETTERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $415.00 Receipt Number H 727791

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $415.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DAVID RAY LETTERMAN ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR QUIET OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $415.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000222CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VRASPIR , TODD WILLARD