Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 21:07:48 (UTC).

LEE, JAMES CLINTON, LEE, MARGARET Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 LEE, JAMES CLINTON, LEE, MARGARET was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEE, MARGARET

Decedent

LEE, JAMES CLINTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ELLIS, DAWN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $18.50 Receipt Number H 728536

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $18.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF JAMES CLINTON LEE ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH JAMES LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION INTESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 723372

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000281CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS, DAWN