This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 04/23/2021 at 16:20:48 (UTC).

LADRIGAN, DENNIS VS ROZSA, AVA Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 LADRIGAN, DENNIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROZSA, AVA. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LADRIGAN, DENNIS

Defendants

ROZSA, KELLYANN

ROZSA, AVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANZER, STEPHEN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KELLYANN ROZSA 040821

04/13/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KELLYANN ROZSA 040821

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON AVA ROZSA (SUBST SERVED TO KELLY ANN ROZSA) 040821

04/13/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON AVA ROZSA (SUBST SERVED TO KELLY ANN ROZSA) 040821

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: AVA ROSZA

03/26/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: AVA ROSZA

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KELLYANN ROZSA

03/26/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KELLYANN ROZSA

SUMMONS ISSUED TO AVA ROZSA ~ BLANK

03/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO AVA ROZSA ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLYANN ROZSA ~ BLANK

03/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLYANN ROZSA ~ BLANK

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/24/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/24/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

INTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

03/24/2021:INTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

INTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

03/24/2021:INTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

03/24/2021:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

COVER SHEET

03/24/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KELLYANN ROZSA 040821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON AVA ROZSA (SUBST SERVED TO KELLY ANN ROZSA) 040821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: AVA ROSZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KELLYANN ROZSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 728259

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO AVA ROZSA ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLYANN ROZSA ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000228CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPHEN ROBERT KANZER