This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 06/06/2019 at 13:17:25 (UTC).

KRUZIKAS, CAROL Et Al VS BERKMAN, ANDREA MARIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 KRUZIKAS, CAROL filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BERKMAN, ANDREA MARIA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRUZIKAS, CAROL

KRUZIKAS, GEORGE

Defendants

NIEHAUS, PATRICIA

BERKMAN, ANDREA MARIA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION AGAINST ANDREA BERKMAN AND PATIRICIA NIHAUS

06/05/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION AGAINST ANDREA BERKMAN AND PATIRICIA NIHAUS

DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION FOR POSSESSION ONLY*

06/03/2019:DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION FOR POSSESSION ONLY*

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST ANDREA BERKMAN AND PATRICIA NIEHAUS

05/28/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST ANDREA BERKMAN AND PATRICIA NIEHAUS

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

05/28/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON PATRICIA NIEHAUS (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 051719

05/22/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON PATRICIA NIEHAUS (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 051719

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ANDREA BERKMAN (INDIVIDUAL) AT 051619

05/22/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ANDREA BERKMAN (INDIVIDUAL) AT 051619

PETITION FOR EVICTION & DAMAGES & 3 DAY NTOICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION

05/13/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION & DAMAGES & 3 DAY NTOICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/13/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PATRICIA NIEHAUS

05/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PATRICIA NIEHAUS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANDREA BERKMAN

05/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANDREA BERKMAN

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - PATRICIA NIEHAUS

05/13/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - PATRICIA NIEHAUS

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - ANDREWA BERKMAN

05/13/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - ANDREWA BERKMAN

DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

05/13/2019:DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

05/13/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION AGAINST ANDREA BERKMAN AND PATIRICIA NIHAUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION FOR POSSESSION ONLY*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST ANDREA BERKMAN AND PATRICIA NIEHAUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON PATRICIA NIEHAUS (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 051719

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON ANDREA BERKMAN (INDIVIDUAL) AT 051619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PATRICIA NIEHAUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANDREA BERKMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION & DAMAGES & 3 DAY NTOICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number H 625904

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $219.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Case 272019CC000625CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less