Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 21:09:39 (UTC).

KLEMME, FREDERICK E, KLEMME, NORA J Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 KLEMME, FREDERICK E, KLEMME, NORA J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

KLEMME, NORA J

Decedent

KLEMME, FREDERICK E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ALVAREZ, DEREK BRIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF LEGAL PUBLICATION LA GACETA ON 03/19/2021 AND 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT NORA J. KLEMME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF FREDERICK E. KLEMME ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH FREDERICK E. KLEMME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT NORA J. KLEMME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES AFFIDAVIT OF ESTATE BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION INTESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 723365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000279CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ , DEREK B