This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/01/2021 at 23:10:52 (UTC).

KINNARI INC VS BOULERICE ROOFING AND SUPPLY I

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 KINNARI INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BOULERICE ROOFING AND SUPPLY I. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINNARI INC

Defendant

BOULERICE ROOFING AND SUPPLY I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILKA, DANIEL FREDRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY FILED ON 100821 FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFS ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLNTFS INTERROGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEFS AFFIRM DEFENSES FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BOULERICE ROOFING AND SUPPLY INC C O GARY A POE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 727298

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS dpilka@pilka.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BOULERICE ROOFING AND SUPPLY INC CO GARY A POE ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000215CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PILKA, DANIEL FREDRICK