Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 19:35:50 (UTC).

KINDRED, KENDRA M VS MIRANDA, RAYMOND L JR

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 KINDRED, KENDRA M filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against MIRANDA, RAYMOND L JR. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KINDRED, KENDRA M

Respondent

MIRANDA, RAYMOND L JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZAKARIA, JODI ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD RAYMOND MIRANDA 4/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RAYMOND L MIRANDA SIGNED AND SEALED BY CLERK 3/31/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT KENDRA KINDRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000613DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAKARIA, JODI