This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 10:57:59 (UTC).

KENNETH PHILLIPS AND KRISTY PH VS HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 KENNETH PHILLIPS AND KRISTY PH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE, SCAGLIONE, DONALD E, ANGELIADIS, GEORGE and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

ANGELIADIS, GEORGE

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNETH PHILLIPS AND KRISTY PH

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACKERMAN, COREY MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

BARRERA, DAVID ALEXIS

CULLETON, SARAH KATE

 

Court Documents

MOTION IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET

04/20/2020:MOTION IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY FILED BY DEF

04/17/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID BARRERA ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS dbarrera@heritagepci.com

04/17/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID BARRERA ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS dbarrera@heritagepci.com

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 040120

04/02/2020:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 040120

AMENDED ADMIN ORDER RE COURT CLOSURE DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC DTD 032420

03/26/2020:AMENDED ADMIN ORDER RE COURT CLOSURE DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC DTD 032420

AMENDED ADMIN ORDER RE COURT CLOSURE DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC DTD 032420

03/25/2020:AMENDED ADMIN ORDER RE COURT CLOSURE DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC DTD 032420

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

03/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/20/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/20/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF - SETTLEMENT -FILED BY PL

10/19/2021:NOTICE OF - SETTLEMENT -FILED BY PL

NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE AND READY TO BE SET FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLNTFS

09/29/2021:NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE AND READY TO BE SET FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLNTFS

CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION ON 100521 AT 2:00 FILED BY DEF

09/24/2021:CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION ON 100521 AT 2:00 FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE

06/11/2021:NOTICE - HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTIONS TO PLNTFS NTC OF TAKING DEPO DUCES TECUM OF DEFS FIELD ADJUSTER FILED BY DEF

05/28/2021:MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTIONS TO PLNTFS NTC OF TAKING DEPO DUCES TECUM OF DEFS FIELD ADJUSTER FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY FOR DEF TO SARAH CULLETON ESQ AND EMAIL DESIG sculleton@heritagepci.com

05/19/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY FOR DEF TO SARAH CULLETON ESQ AND EMAIL DESIG sculleton@heritagepci.com

ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN FOR ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION IS GRANTED - TO TAKE PLACE VIA ELECTRONIC MEANS W/I 45 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER DTD 010421

01/04/2021:ORDER FILED ON PLNTFS MTN FOR ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION IS GRANTED - TO TAKE PLACE VIA ELECTRONIC MEANS W/I 45 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER DTD 010421

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF HOWARD WALL SCHED FOR 010521 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM

12/21/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF HOWARD WALL SCHED FOR 010521 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF HOWARD WALL ON 010521 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

12/16/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF HOWARD WALL ON 010521 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - SETTLEMENT -FILED BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - IMPASSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE AND READY TO BE SET FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLNTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION ON 100521 AT 2:00 FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFS DESIG CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE ON 021822 AT 11:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 100521 AT 2PM BEFORE RICHARD W. HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE, AS MEDIATOR VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLETION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS RPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTIONS TO PLNTFS NTC OF TAKING DEPO DUCES TECUM OF DEFS FIELD ADJUSTER FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY FOR DEF TO SARAH CULLETON ESQ AND EMAIL DESIG sculleton@heritagepci.com

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000299CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRERA, DAVID ALEXIS