Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/06/2021 at 21:00:34 (UTC).

KELLER, KEVIN, KELLER, RICHARD JOSEPH Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 KELLER, KEVIN, KELLER, RICHARD JOSEPH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

KELLER, RICHARD JOSEPH

Not Classified By Court

KELLER, KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Classified By Court Attorney

HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF RICHARD J. KELLER ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH RICHARD JOSEPH KELLER ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY RICHARD J KELLER (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH RICHARD JOSPEH KELLER (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 729928

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000464CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/6/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD