This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/08/2021 at 19:48:31 (UTC).

KEELING, ERIC W VS CLOYD, KRISTI

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 KEELING, ERIC W filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CLOYD, KRISTI. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEELING, ERIC W

Respondent

CLOYD, KRISTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

OZYJOWSKI, KAREN CONTEGIACOMO

Respondent Attorney

MULLIGAN, CHRISTOPHER SEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KRISTIE S. GRAY N/K/A KRISTIE S. CLOYD ON 06/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON 06/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CHRISTOPHER S. MULLIGAN, ESQ. OBO RESPONDENT/MOTHER KRISTIE GRAY N/K/A KRISTIE CLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR: OF STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number H 743110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketReceipt 742255 for: 418.0000 voided

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB - ERIC W KEELING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMP RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL PETITION/MODIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR001111DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OZYJOWSKI, KAREN CONTEGIACOMO