Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/29/2019 at 13:16:01 (UTC).

KARAS, JOAN VS BRUNNELL, NANCY

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 KARAS, JOAN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRUNNELL, NANCY. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KARAS, JOAN

Defendant

BRUNNELL, NANCY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON NANCY BRUNNELL ON 03152019

03/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON NANCY BRUNNELL ON 03152019

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY DTD 031419

03/14/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY DTD 031419

COURT WORKSHEET - THE COURT FINDS THE LEASE/VERBAL WAS TERMINATED ON 2/16 - PLAINTIFF IS ENTITLED TO JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE DONE - CLERK TO PREPARE

03/13/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - THE COURT FINDS THE LEASE/VERBAL WAS TERMINATED ON 2/16 - PLAINTIFF IS ENTITLED TO JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE DONE - CLERK TO PREPARE

NOTICE OF FINAL EVICTION HEARING-SET FOR 031319 @ 2:15PM-COURTROOM B- JUDGE HITZEMANN-

03/07/2019:NOTICE OF FINAL EVICTION HEARING-SET FOR 031319 @ 2:15PM-COURTROOM B- JUDGE HITZEMANN-

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON NANCY BRUNNELL (INDIVIDUAL) AT 030619

03/11/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON NANCY BRUNNELL (INDIVIDUAL) AT 030619

DOCUMENTS FILED - COPY OF MOTEL 6 RECEIPT FILED BY NANCY BURNELL

03/07/2019:DOCUMENTS FILED - COPY OF MOTEL 6 RECEIPT FILED BY NANCY BURNELL

RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT NANCY BURNNELL

03/06/2019:RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT NANCY BURNNELL

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/05/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

03/05/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 15 DAY NOTICE

03/05/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 15 DAY NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON NANCY BRUNNELL ON 03152019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY DTD 031419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 615984

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT WORKSHEET - THE COURT FINDS THE LEASE/VERBAL WAS TERMINATED ON 2/16 - PLAINTIFF IS ENTITLED TO JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE DONE - CLERK TO PREPARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON NANCY BRUNNELL (INDIVIDUAL) AT 030619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FINAL EVICTION HEARING-SET FOR 031319 @ 2:15PM-COURTROOM B- JUDGE HITZEMANN-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - COPY OF MOTEL 6 RECEIPT FILED BY NANCY BURNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION, 15 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 614339

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Case 272019CC000315CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less