This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 13:14:40 (UTC).

JORDAN, ALISA M VS BARBERA, CATERINA M Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 JORDAN, ALISA M filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BARBERA, CATERINA M. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORDAN, ALISA M

Defendants

BARBERA, CATERINA M

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

PADULA, DENIS M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWMAN, STEPHANIE ANNE

Defendant Attorney

UNICE, THOMAS ROBERT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

09/30/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S NTC OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION FILED BY PLNTF

09/08/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S NTC OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT)

09/03/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT)

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FROM DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

08/26/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FROM DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR COPIES AND LIMITED OBJECTIONS TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S NTC OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION FILED BY PLNTF

08/21/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES AND LIMITED OBJECTIONS TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S NTC OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FROM DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

08/18/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FROM DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO COLLATERAL SOURCE REQUESTS FOR PROD FROM DEF, DENIS M PADULA FILED BY PLNTF

07/23/2020:RESPONSE TO COLLATERAL SOURCE REQUESTS FOR PROD FROM DEF, DENIS M PADULA FILED BY PLNTF

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY 071420

07/23/2020:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY 071420

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

07/22/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF - DISCLOSURE FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

07/22/2020:NOTICE OF - DISCLOSURE FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DENIS M PADULA

06/23/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DENIS M PADULA

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) UPON PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DENIS M PADULA

06/23/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) UPON PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DENIS M PADULA

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DENIS M PADULA

06/23/2020:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DENIS M PADULA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF T.R. UNICE JR ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF, DENIS M PADULA AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS service@unicesalzman.com

06/23/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF T.R. UNICE JR ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF, DENIS M PADULA AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS service@unicesalzman.com

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GEICO GENERAL INS COMPANY

05/29/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GEICO GENERAL INS COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CAGTHERINA M BARBARA

05/29/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CAGTHERINA M BARBARA

ADMIN ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 022820 DTD 022820

05/28/2020:ADMIN ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 022820 DTD 022820

SUMMONS ISSUED DENIS N PADULA - BLANK

05/26/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED DENIS N PADULA - BLANK

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL OF- ALL REQUESTS FOR COPIES TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSRUANCE COMPANY'S NOTICES OF NON-PARTY PROD FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON PLNTF FILED BY DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S NTC OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FROM DEF GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FROM DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES AND LIMITED OBJECTIONS TO DEF, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S NTC OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - FILED BY GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number H 683616

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DENIS N PADULA - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INS COMPANY - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR CATERINA M BARBERA - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000455CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ROBERT UNICE JR, ESQ