This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/29/2019 at 16:15:39 (UTC).

JORAY, LARRY JR VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 JORAY, LARRY JR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JORAY, LARRY JR

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, TRACY ANN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/05/2019:COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS SERVICE@TONERRAMIREZ.COM

06/05/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS SERVICE@TONERRAMIREZ.COM

SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (BLANK)

06/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (BLANK)

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

06/05/2019:COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

NOTICE OF - OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF

06/05/2019:NOTICE OF - OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DOCUMENTS TO DEF

06/05/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DOCUMENTS TO DEF

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

06/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 061419

06/18/2019:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 061419

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

06/24/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS eservice@oxendinelaw.com FILED BY DEF

06/26/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS eservice@oxendinelaw.com FILED BY DEF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

06/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

06/26/2019:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

08/05/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD AND AVOIDANCE

06/28/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD AND AVOIDANCE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

11/21/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF FILED BY PLNTF

10/15/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER BAYONET POINT; MORTON PLANT NORTH BAY HOSPITAL; COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FILED BY DEF

10/16/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER BAYONET POINT; MORTON PLANT NORTH BAY HOSPITAL; COMMUNITY HOSPITAL FILED BY DEF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

10/15/2019:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS eservice@oxendinelaw.com FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 061419

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 629946

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DOCUMENTS TO DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS SERVICE@TONERRAMIREZ.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA000652CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/5/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRACY A RAMIREZ