This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 09/22/2020 at 15:20:00 (UTC).

JONES, TERRI Et Al VS BERGER, JENESSA R Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 JONES, TERRI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BERGER, JENESSA R. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES, TERRI

LISA, STEPHANIE ANDREA

Defendants

BERGER, JENESSA R

WRAGA, JOHN M III

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JENESSA R BERGER 9/18/2020

09/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JENESSA R BERGER 9/18/2020

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUBSTITUTE 9/18/2020 JENESSA BERGER CO RESIDENT TO JOHN M WRAGA iii

09/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUBSTITUTE 9/18/2020 JENESSA BERGER CO RESIDENT TO JOHN M WRAGA iii

ANSWER FILED BY JOHN WRAGA III & JENESSA R BERGER

10/08/2020:ANSWER FILED BY JOHN WRAGA III & JENESSA R BERGER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENESSA R BERGER

09/14/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENESSA R BERGER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN M WRAGA III

09/14/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN M WRAGA III

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

09/11/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED JENESSA R BERGER - BLANK

09/11/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED JENESSA R BERGER - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN M WRAGA III - BLANK

09/11/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN M WRAGA III - BLANK

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS: CLIFFORD A TAYLOR ESQ, EMAIL - ctaylor@hoganlawfirm.com, OBO PLAINTIFF

09/11/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS: CLIFFORD A TAYLOR ESQ, EMAIL - ctaylor@hoganlawfirm.com, OBO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS: STEPHANIE A LISA ESQ, EMAIL - salisa@hoganlawfirm.com, OBO PLAINTIFF

09/11/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS: STEPHANIE A LISA ESQ, EMAIL - salisa@hoganlawfirm.com, OBO PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET

09/11/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENESSA R BERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN M WRAGA III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JENESSA R BERGER - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JOHN M WRAGA III - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS: CLIFFORD A TAYLOR ESQ, EMAIL - ctaylor@hoganlawfirm.com, OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS: STEPHANIE A LISA ESQ, EMAIL - salisa@hoganlawfirm.com, OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $424.00 Receipt Number H 698328

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $424.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $424.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000755CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less