This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/16/2019 at 18:17:30 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS MARTIN, FLORA

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTIN, FLORA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

MARTIN, FLORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON FLORA MARTIN 3/8/19

03/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON FLORA MARTIN 3/8/19

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FLORA MARTIN - PTC 041019 AT 10:45 CRTRM C

02/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FLORA MARTIN - PTC 041019 AT 10:45 CRTRM C

SUMMONS ISSUED FLORA MARTIN - BLANK

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FLORA MARTIN - BLANK

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

02/20/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/20/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON FLORA MARTIN 3/8/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FLORA MARTIN - PTC 041019 AT 10:45 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 612336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FLORA MARTIN - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Case 272019SC000472SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less