Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/28/2019 at 13:16:16 (UTC).

JEAN-MARIE, JACKSON VS GARDELLA, AMBER Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 JEAN-MARIE, JACKSON filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GARDELLA, AMBER. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEAN-MARIE, JACKSON

Defendants

GARDELLA, AMBER

GARDELLA, JOHN

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RTND SRVD TO JOHN GARDELLA AND AMBER GARDELLA ON 04252019

05/01/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION RTND SRVD TO JOHN GARDELLA AND AMBER GARDELLA ON 04252019

WRIT OF POSSESSION GIVEN TO PLANTIFF

04/24/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION GIVEN TO PLANTIFF

DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION GRANTED FOR WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE - DTD 042319

04/23/2019:DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION GRANTED FOR WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE - DTD 042319

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST JOHN GARDELLA AND AMBER GARDELLA

04/17/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST JOHN GARDELLA AND AMBER GARDELLA

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

04/17/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JOHN GARDELLA (INDIVIDUAL) AT 040519

04/08/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JOHN GARDELLA (INDIVIDUAL) AT 040519

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON AMBER GARDELLA (INDIVIDUAL) AT 040519

04/08/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON AMBER GARDELLA (INDIVIDUAL) AT 040519

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

04/04/2019:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: AMBER GARDELLA

04/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: AMBER GARDELLA

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN GARDELLA

04/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN GARDELLA

DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

04/04/2019:DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

04/04/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

NOTICE - EVICTION 3 DAY

04/04/2019:NOTICE - EVICTION 3 DAY

PETITION FOR EVICTION

04/04/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION GIVEN TO PLANTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 622685

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Assessment 4 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION GRANTED FOR WHICH LET WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE - DTD 042319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST JOHN GARDELLA AND AMBER GARDELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JOHN GARDELLA (INDIVIDUAL) AT 040519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON AMBER GARDELLA (INDIVIDUAL) AT 040519

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number H 619767

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Assessment 3 Total Assessed $14.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Case 272019CC000484CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less