Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/17/2019 at 13:16:49 (UTC).

HTG HAMMOCK RIDGE LLC VS AGUILAR, DAMIEN A Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 HTG HAMMOCK RIDGE LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against AGUILAR, DAMIEN A. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HTG HAMMOCK RIDGE LLC

Defendants

AGUILAR, DAMIEN A

AMICK, REBECCA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCAIN, RYAN RUFFNER

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - POSTED 3/25/19 AT 8:56AM

03/29/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - POSTED 3/25/19 AT 8:56AM

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 031919 (SO)

03/19/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 031919 (SO)

DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT (POSSESSION) - EVICTION DTD 031519

03/18/2019:DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT (POSSESSION) - EVICTION DTD 031519

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENANTS DAMIEN A AGUILAR AND REBECCA A AMICK

03/14/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENANTS DAMIEN A AGUILAR AND REBECCA A AMICK

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

03/11/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FJ FOR EVICTION AS TO POSSESSION

03/11/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FJ FOR EVICTION AS TO POSSESSION

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

03/11/2019:DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DAMIEN A AGUILAR AND REBECCA A AMICK

03/11/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DAMIEN A AGUILAR AND REBECCA A AMICK

RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON REBECCA A. AMICK (POSTED) AT 022819

03/08/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON REBECCA A. AMICK (POSTED) AT 022819

RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON DAMIEN A. AGUILAR (POSTED) AT 022819

03/08/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON DAMIEN A. AGUILAR (POSTED) AT 022819

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - COPY OF COMPLAINT W/SUMMONS' WERE MAILED TO DEFENDANTS ON 022819

02/28/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - COPY OF COMPLAINT W/SUMMONS' WERE MAILED TO DEFENDANTS ON 022819

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: REBECCA A AMICK

02/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: REBECCA A AMICK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DAMIEN A AGULIAR

02/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DAMIEN A AGULIAR

SUMMONS ISSUED DAMIEN A AGUILAR - BLANK

02/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DAMIEN A AGUILAR - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED REBECCA A AMICK - BLANK

02/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED REBECCA A AMICK - BLANK

PETITION FOR EVICTION

02/21/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION

COVER SHEET

02/21/2019:COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENANTS DAMIEN A AGUILAR AND REBECCA A AMICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT FJ FOR EVICTION AS TO POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DAMIEN A AGUILAR AND REBECCA A AMICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON REBECCA A. AMICK (POSTED) AT 022819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON DAMIEN A. AGUILAR (POSTED) AT 022819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - COPY OF COMPLAINT W/SUMMONS' WERE MAILED TO DEFENDANTS ON 022819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: REBECCA A AMICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DAMIEN A AGULIAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number H 612547

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DAMIEN A AGUILAR - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED REBECCA A AMICK - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case 272019CC000265CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN