This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/31/2020 at 21:04:48 (UTC).

HOUSE, ARTHUR FRAN, PADGETT, JUDITH L Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 HOUSE, ARTHUR FRAN, PADGETT, JUDITH L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PADGETT, JUDITH L

Decedent

HOUSE, ARTHUR FRAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BURPEE, MELANIE JOAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCOPY/SEARCH REQUEST FORM COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $4.00 Receipt Number H 694462

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY DTD 081220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 081220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ARTHUR FRAN HOUSE (ORIG) OR BOOK 3871 PG 1603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 692984

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ARTHUR FRAN HOUSE (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (INTESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP000798CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURPEE, MELANIE JOAN