Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 21:25:01 (UTC).

HOBART GREER, FATIMA, HOBART, DANIELLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 HOBART GREER, FATIMA, HOBART, DANIELLE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

HOBART, DANIELLE

Decedent

HOBART GREER, FATIMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DANI, LEE KARINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $6.00 Receipt Number H 734047

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $6.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FORMAL NOTICE AS TO MARK HOBART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE OF OF A PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE OF OF A PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION INTESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 728998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000450CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH FATIMA HOBART GEER (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF FATIMA HOBART GEER (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000359CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANI, LEE K