Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/04/2019 at 13:17:40 (UTC).

HIGH POINT COMMUNITY PROPERTY VS BORGER, BARBARA ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 HIGH POINT COMMUNITY PROPERTY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BORGER, BARBARA ANN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIGH POINT COMMUNITY PROPERTY

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN

UNKNOWN TENANTS

BORGER, BARBARA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULLIS, BRANDON K

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS

03/26/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS

RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN BORGER

03/26/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN BORGER

RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON BARBARA ANN BORGER (PERSONAL) AT 032219

03/26/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON BARBARA ANN BORGER (PERSONAL) AT 032219

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR:UNKNOWN TENANTS

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR:UNKNOWN TENANTS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN BORGER

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN BORGER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BARBARA ANN BORGER

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BARBARA ANN BORGER

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANTS (BLANK)

03/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANTS (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN BORGER (BLANK)

03/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN BORGER (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED BARBARA ANN BORGER (BLANK)

03/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED BARBARA ANN BORGER (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

03/12/2019:COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

03/12/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT-FORECLOSURE COUNTY

03/12/2019:COMPLAINT-FORECLOSURE COUNTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN BORGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON BARBARA ANN BORGER (PERSONAL) AT 032219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR:UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN BORGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BARBARA ANN BORGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment received: $335.00 Receipt Number H 615947

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $335.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANTS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA ANN BORGER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED BARBARA ANN BORGER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT-FORECLOSURE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $335.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Case 272019CC000365CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLIS , BRANDON K