Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 21:16:44 (UTC).

HESS, HOWARD, HESS, ROBERT WILLIAME Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 HESS, HOWARD, HESS, ROBERT WILLIAME was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

HESS, ROBERT WILLIAME

Not Classified By Court

HESS, HOWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DAY, DAVID JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES AND NOTICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 040921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED ADMITTING CODICIL TO PROBATE DTD 040921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 040921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCODICIL TO LAST WILL & TESTAMENT OF ROBERT HESS (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ROBERT HESS (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY ROBERT HESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCODICIL TO LAST WILL & TEST ROBERT HESS (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ROBERT WILLIAM HESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT HOWARD HESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000456CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAY, DAVID JEFFREY