This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 19:39:08 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS WEEKS, RICHIE

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEEKS, RICHIE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

WEEKS, RICHIE

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEELE, ANTHONY JOHN

 

Court Documents

COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE PENDING SERVICE

02/28/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE PENDING SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED TO RICHIE WEEKS

02/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED TO RICHIE WEEKS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHIE WEEKS - PTC 022819 AT 9:30 CRTRM B

01/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHIE WEEKS - PTC 022819 AT 9:30 CRTRM B

SUMMONS ISSUED RICHIE WEEKS - BLANK

01/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED RICHIE WEEKS - BLANK

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,951.35

01/11/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,951.35

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE PENDING SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED TO RICHIE WEEKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHIE WEEKS - PTC 022819 AT 9:30 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 605414

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED RICHIE WEEKS - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,951.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Case 272019SC000115SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less