This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 15:58:16 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS ROBERTS, KELVIN A

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERTS, KELVIN A. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

ROBERTS, KELVIN A

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/23/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM 2929.85

06/23/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM 2929.85

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELVIN ROBERTS ~ BLANK

06/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELVIN ROBERTS ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KELVIN ROBERTS - PTC 090321 AT 11:00 CRTRM C

06/30/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KELVIN ROBERTS - PTC 090321 AT 11:00 CRTRM C

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KELVIN ROBERTS 080921 - PTC 090321 AT 11AM CRTRM C

08/11/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KELVIN ROBERTS 080921 - PTC 090321 AT 11AM CRTRM C

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR PTC ON 080321 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

08/27/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR PTC ON 080321 AT 11AM -FILED BY PL

ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ON 090321 AT 11AM (PLNTF) -DTD 082721

08/30/2021:ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ON 090321 AT 11AM (PLNTF) -DTD 082721

AGREEMENT - DEF IS INDEBTED TO PLNTF IN THE PRINC AMT OF $2929.85, CRT COSTS OF $380.85, FOR A TOTAL CLAIM OF $3310.70, DEF TO PAY $110 PER MONTH BEGINNING 092721 -SIGNED BY DEF & PLNTF

09/02/2021:AGREEMENT - DEF IS INDEBTED TO PLNTF IN THE PRINC AMT OF $2929.85, CRT COSTS OF $380.85, FOR A TOTAL CLAIM OF $3310.70, DEF TO PAY $110 PER MONTH BEGINNING 092721 -SIGNED BY DEF & PLNTF

COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE - PENDING SETTLEMENT

09/03/2021:COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUE - PENDING SETTLEMENT

ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PLNTF) FOR PTC ON 090321 AT 11AM=GRANTED -DTD 082721

09/08/2021:ORDER FILED FOR ALLOWANCE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (PLNTF) FOR PTC ON 090321 AT 11AM=GRANTED -DTD 082721

ORDER FILED - SETTLEMENT STIP/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL -DTD 090821

09/24/2021:ORDER FILED - SETTLEMENT STIP/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL -DTD 090821

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT BASED ON DEFAULT IN STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

10/19/2021:MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT BASED ON DEFAULT IN STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

10/19/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

JUDGMENT FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT PL SHALL RECOVER FROM DEF THE PRINC SUM OF $2929.85, CRT COSTS OF $380.85, FOR A TOTAL OF $3310.70, ALL OF WHICH BEARS INTEREST AT THE STAT RATE, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE -DTD 102621

10/26/2021:JUDGMENT FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT PL SHALL RECOVER FROM DEF THE PRINC SUM OF $2929.85, CRT COSTS OF $380.85, FOR A TOTAL OF $3310.70, ALL OF WHICH BEARS INTEREST AT THE STAT RATE, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE -DTD 102621

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to RECLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketReopen Civil Other closed on 10/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - FINAL JUDGMENT PL SHALL RECOVER FROM DEF THE PRINC SUM OF $2929.85, CRT COSTS OF $380.85, FOR A TOTAL OF $3310.70, ALL OF WHICH BEARS INTEREST AT THE STAT RATE, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE -DTD 102621

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPENED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketReopened for Civil Other on 10/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT BASED ON DEFAULT IN STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketReopen Date: 10/19/2021; Reopen Close Date: 10/26/2021; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED - SETTLEMENT STIP/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL -DTD 090821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON KELVIN ROBERTS 080921 - PTC 090321 AT 11AM CRTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KELVIN ROBERTS - PTC 090321 AT 11:00 CRTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 743552

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KELVIN ROBERTS ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 2929.85

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC001605SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant